Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/12/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/12/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/12/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/12/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/26/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/05/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/27/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/29/2006