Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/30/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/11/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/14/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/15/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/20/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/21/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/27/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/28/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/06/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/17/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/26/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/08/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/13/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/01/2006