Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/30/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/30/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/30/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/13/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/21/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/26/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/26/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/07/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/08/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/27/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/17/2005
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/28/2006