Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/11/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/11/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/11/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/11/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/11/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/12/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/12/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/20/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/02/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/22/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/22/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/12/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/13/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/26/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/20/2006
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 11/14/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/05/2006