Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/15/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/18/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/18/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/18/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/19/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/25/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/26/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/29/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/28/2005