Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/19/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/27/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/06/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/06/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/06/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/06/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/15/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/29/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/01/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 11/02/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/02/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/25/2006