Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/18/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/22/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/22/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/22/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/22/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/22/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/26/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/26/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/19/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/26/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/04/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/06/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/18/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/08/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/17/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/17/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/17/2005