Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/18/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/20/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/20/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/20/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/20/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/26/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/29/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/04/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/01/2006