Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/19/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/19/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/19/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/21/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/22/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/29/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/26/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/08/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/14/2006