Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 07/21/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 07/21/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/26/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/29/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/07/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/12/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/12/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/26/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/26/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/17/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/17/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/20/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/20/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/20/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/24/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/27/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/27/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/27/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/27/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/27/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/27/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 11/01/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/07/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/09/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/12/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/19/2006