There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Indian Land Probate Reform Technical Corrections Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Indian Land Probate Reform Technical Corrections Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Indian Land Probate Reform Technical Corrections Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Indian Land Consolidation Act to provide for probate reform.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-157. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005Presented to President.
12/19/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H12217-12218)
12/19/2005Committee on Resources discharged.
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9053-9055; text as passed Senate: S9053-9054)
07/26/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-157. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2005-1:01amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2005-1:01amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H12217-12218)
12/19/2005-1:01amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12217-12218)
12/19/2005-1:01amHouseMr. Pombo asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/19/2005HouseCommittee on Resources discharged.
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9053-9055; text as passed Senate: S9053-9054)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
12/19/2005 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.1481.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1481. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-157 (12/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Indian Land Probate Reform Technical Corrections Act of 2005 - Amends the Indian Land Consolidation Act to make technical amendments with regard to: (1) partition of highly fractionated Indian land; (2) tribal probate codes; (3) descent and distribution; (4) the fractional interest acquisition program; (5) establishment of fair market value; and (6) land ownership information.