Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 07/29/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/29/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/06/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/06/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/08/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/27/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/09/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/12/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/27/2006