Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/26/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/29/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/06/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/06/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/06/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/07/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/08/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/08/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/12/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/13/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/14/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/15/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/15/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/04/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/03/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/10/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/10/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/16/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/17/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/09/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/15/2006