Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/06/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/06/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 10/03/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/04/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/06/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 10/21/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/25/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/26/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 11/16/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/16/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/18/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 12/12/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/19/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/01/2006