There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Captive Primate Safety Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Captive Primate Safety Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Captive Primate Safety Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to add non-human primates to the definition of prohibited wildlife species.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/11/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7357-7358; text: CR S7358)
06/19/2006Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 109-263.
07/27/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
07/13/2006HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
07/13/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/12/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/12/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/12/2006-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
07/11/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7357-7358; text: CR S7358)
06/19/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 471.
06/19/2006SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. With written report No. 109-263.
05/23/2006SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/27/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9184)
07/27/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9183-9184)

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/04/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/23/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/25/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works07/27/2005 Referred to
05/23/2006 Markup by
06/19/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-263
House Resources07/12/2006 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans07/13/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1509. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/11/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Captive Primate Safety Act of 2005 - Amends the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to add non-human primates to the definition of "prohibited wildlife species" to which such Act's requirements (e.g., prohibition against sale or purchase in interstate or foreign commerce) apply.