Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/27/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/29/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/06/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/06/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/19/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/06/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/31/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/02/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/07/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/08/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/27/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/27/2006