Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/28/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/28/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 07/28/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/05/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/08/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/08/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/13/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 08/03/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/06/2006