There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Rim of the Valley Corridor Study Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Rim of the Valley Corridor Study Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Rim of the Valley Corridor Study Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a resource study of the Rim of the Valley Corridor in the State of California to evaluate alternatives for protecting the resources of the Corridor, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9019)
02/23/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 02/17/05 without amendment. With written report No. 109-9.
01/25/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/01/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9019)
02/23/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 20.
02/23/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 02/17/05 without amendment. With written report No. 109-9.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/25/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S473-474)
01/25/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S473)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/25/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/25/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
02/23/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-9
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/01/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Rim of the Valley Corridor Study Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to conduct and submit a report to specified congressional committees on a resource study of the Rim of the Valley Corridor in California to evaluate various alternatives for protecting the Corridor's resources, including designating all or part of the Corridor as a unit of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area.

Lists the objectives the Secretary shall seek to achieve in conducting the study.

Requires the Secretary to analyze: (1) the potential impact of each alternative on staffing and other potential costs to Federal, State, and local agencies and other organizations; and (2) the potential impact that designating all or part of the Rim of the Valley Corridor as a unit of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area would have on land in or bordering the area that is privately owned as of the date on which the study is conducted.

Requires the report to include the concerns of private landowners within the boundaries of the Recreation Area.