Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/06/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/06/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/06/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/07/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/07/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/07/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/09/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/19/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/06/2006