Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/07/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/08/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/08/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/09/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/09/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/12/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/13/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/13/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/19/2005