Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
04/27/2005 Became Public Law No: 109-9.
04/27/2005 Signed by President.
04/22/2005 Presented to President.
04/19/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2114-2117)
04/12/2005 Committee on House Administration discharged.
04/12/2005 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-33, Part I.
02/01/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S827-829)
02/01/2005 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/25/2005 Introduced in Senate