Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 09/13/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/15/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/21/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/29/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/01/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/28/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/03/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/05/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/07/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/08/2006