Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/14/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/14/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/05/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/28/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 11/03/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/03/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/07/2005