Summary: S.1713 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-112 (11/22/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 26, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Iran Nonproliferation Amendments Act of 2005 - Amends the Iran Nonproliferation Act of 2000 to state that the definition of "extraordinary payments in connection with the International Space Station" does not mean payments in cash or in kind made or to be made by the U.S. government prior to January 1, 2012, for work to be performed or services to be rendered prior to that date necessary to meet U.S. obligations under the Agreement Concerning Cooperation on the Civil International Space Station, with annex, signed at Washington January 29, 1998, and entered into force March 27, 2001, or any protocol, agreement, memorandum of understanding, or contract related thereto. (Under such Act the United States is prohibited from making such payments to the Russian Aviation and Space Agency unless specified determinations are made with respect to Russian cooperation in preventing proliferation to Iran, or to a foreign person identified as contributing to proliferation to Iran.)

Prohibits any U.S. agency from making extraordinary payments and any other payments (currently, such prohibition is limited to extraordinary payments) in connection with the International Space Station to a foreign person subject to specified measures under such Act or Executive Order No. 12938.

Directs the President to submit to the Committee on Foreign Relations of the Senate and the Committee on International Relations of the House of Representatives a report that identifies each Russian entity or person to whom the United States has, since the date of enactment of this Act, made a cash or in-kind payment under the Agreement.

Requires such report to include: (1) the purpose of each payment; and (2) with respect to each such payment, an assessment that the payment was not prejudicial to preventing the proliferation of ballistic or cruise missile systems in Iran and other countries that have supported acts of international terrorism.

Applies the provisions of such Act to: (1) Syria with respect to transfers on or after January 1, 2005; and (2) transfers to or from such countries (currently, limited to transfers to Iran).

Redefines "foreign person" or "person" to include any foreign government or government entity (currently, any governmental entity operating as a business enterprise).

Retitles the Iran Nonproliferation Act of 2002 as the Iran and Syria Nonproliferation Act.