Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/15/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/19/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/19/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/19/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/19/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/19/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/20/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/22/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/22/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/22/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/22/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/26/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/30/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/06/2005