Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/19/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/19/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/19/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/19/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/27/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/27/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/27/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/27/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/30/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/03/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/04/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/18/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/18/2006