Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 03/28/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/26/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/26/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/26/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/03/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/04/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/18/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/18/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/23/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/25/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/05/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/08/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/14/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/21/2006