Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 09/21/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/22/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/22/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/22/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/26/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/29/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 09/30/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/04/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/17/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/17/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 10/17/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/18/2005