Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 09/26/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 09/26/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/26/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/26/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/26/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 09/26/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/27/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/29/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 10/05/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/17/2005