Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/27/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/06/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/06/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/17/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/28/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 01/26/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/08/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/01/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/09/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/18/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/25/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/27/2006