There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Medicare Cost-Sharing and Welfare Extension Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Cost-Sharing and Welfare Extension Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend medicare cost-sharing for qualifying individuals through September 2006, to extend the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program, transitional medical assistance under the Medicaid Program, and related programs through March 31, 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/29/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10696)
09/29/2005Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/07/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/29/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/29/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/29/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/29/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2005-4:53pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/29/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S10696)
09/29/2005SenateS.Amdt.1894 Amendment SA 1894 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2005SenateS.Amdt.1894 Amendment SA 1894 proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S10696; text: CR S10696) To eliminate coverage under the Medicare and Medicaid programs for drugs when used for treatment of erectile dysfunction.
09/29/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10696)
09/29/2005SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
09/27/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10517-10518)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/27/2005

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance09/27/2005 Referred to
09/29/2005 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce09/29/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/07/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/29/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1778. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/29/2005)

Medicare Cost-Sharing and Welfare Extension Act of 2005 - Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to extend through September 2006 the program of cost-sharing assistance to qualifying individuals for the Medicare Part B premium (QI program).

Sets the total amount available for allocation for the QI program as follows: (1) for the period that begins on October 1, 2005, and ends on December 31, 2005, at $100 million; and (2) for the period that begins on January 1, 2006, and ends on September 30, 2006, at $300 million.

Extends through March 31, 2006: (1) the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program (TANF) under SSA title IV part A; (2) the separate program for abstinence education; (3) additional grants for Puerto Rico, the Virgin Islands, Guam, and American Samoa; (4) supplemental grants for population increases in certain states; and (5) the Transitional Medical Assistance program under Medicaid. Makes appropriations.

Extends the National Random Sample Study of Child Welfare and Child Welfare Waiver Authority through March 31, 2006.

Excludes drugs used to treat sexual or erectile dysfunction from coverage as prescription drugs under SSA title XVIII (Medicare), beginning in 2007, except when used to treat another condition, subject to Food and Drug Administration approval. Authorizes states to restrict or exclude such drugs from coverage, with the same exception, under Medicaid.