Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 10/04/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/18/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/02/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/29/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/30/2006
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/30/2006