There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Uintah Research and Curatorial Center Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Uintah Research and Curatorial Center Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Uintah Research and Curatorial Center Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the establishment of the Uintah Research and Curatorial Center for Dinosaur National Monument in the States of Colorado and Utah, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9043)
03/17/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment. With written report No. 109-42.
01/26/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9043)
03/17/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 58.
03/17/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment. With written report No. 109-42.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/26/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/26/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S592)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/26/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/17/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-42
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/02/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.182.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.182. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 17, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Uintah Research and Curatorial Center Act - Requires the Secretary of the Interior to establish the Uintah Research and Curatorial Center on land located outside the boundary of the Dinosaur National Monument in Colorado and Utah. Authorizes the Secretary to acquire such land by donation in the vicinity of Vernal, Utah. Makes the map depicting such land available for public inspection in the appropriate offices of the National Park Service.

Requires the Center to be used for the curation of, storage of, and research on items in: (1) the museum collection of the Monument; and (2) any collection maintained by an entity specified in this Act that enters into a cooperative agreement with the Secretary for the curation of, and research on, the museum collection and the development, use, management, and operation of the Center.

Provides that land acquired for the Center shall not be part of the Monument or subject to laws and regulations applicable to the Monument.

Authorizes appropriations.