Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/02/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/09/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/15/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/16/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/04/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 04/06/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/07/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/14/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/14/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/19/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/20/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/20/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/21/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/21/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/09/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/17/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 05/19/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/25/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/21/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/11/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/06/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/01/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/30/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/09/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/06/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/13/2006