There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

State Criminal Alien Assistance Program Reauthorization Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

State Criminal Alien Assistance Program Reauthorization Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

State Criminal Alien Assistance Program Reauthorization Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize appropriations for fiscal years 2005 through 2011 to carry out the State Criminal Alien Assistance Program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5743)
03/17/2005Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Specter without amendment. Without written report.
01/26/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/06/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/24/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/24/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/24/2005-9:01amHouseReceived in the House.
05/23/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5743)
05/23/2005SenateS.Amdt.763 Amendment SA 763 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2005SenateS.Amdt.763 Amendment SA 763 proposed by Senator Burns for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S5743; text: CR S5743) To require that certain funds are used for correctional purposes.
05/23/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5743)
03/17/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 56.
03/17/2005SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Specter without amendment. Without written report.
03/17/2005SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/26/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S599)
01/26/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S598-599)

Cosponsors (17)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/26/2005 Referred to
03/17/2005 Markup by
03/17/2005 Reported by
House Judiciary05/24/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims06/06/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/23/2005)

State Criminal Alien Assistance Program Reauthorization Act of 2005 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize specified appropriations through FY2011 for the State Criminal Alien Assistance Program (SCAAP).

Permits SCAAP funds distributed to States or political subdivisions to be used only for correctional purposes.