Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/26/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/02/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/15/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/01/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/07/2005