Summary: S.1892 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-158 (12/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed in the Senate on December 16, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends federal law declaring that, for purposes of determining the date on which an Indian tribe received a certain reconciliation report for purposes of applying a statute of limitations, any such report provided to or received by an Indian tribe in response to specified requirements under the American Indian Trust Fund Management Reform Act of 1994 shall be deemed to have been received no earlier than December 31, 1999. (The required report is one by the Secretary of the Interior to specified congressional committees identifying for each tribal trust fund account for which the Secretary is responsible a balance reconciled as of September 30, 1995.)

Extends from December 31, 1999, to December 31, 2000, the earliest date on which the Indian tribe shall be deemed to have received the reconciliation report. (This allows a longer statute of limitations for the filing of claims against the United States.)