There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Schools Safely Acquiring Faculty Excellence Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to permit access to Federal crime information databases by educational agencies for certain purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/19/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
07/20/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8015-8016)
Action By: Senate
10/19/2005Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/12/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/19/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/27/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary10/19/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/19/2005)

Schools Safely Acquiring Faculty Excellence Act of 2005 - Directs the Attorney General, upon request of the chief executive officer of a state pursuant to a request by a local or state educational agency, to conduct fingerprint-based checks of the national and state (where possible) crime information databases on individuals under consideration for employment by the agency in a position in which the individual would work with or around children.

Authorizes: (1) the Attorney General and the states to charge any applicable fees for such checks; and (2) an individual to release derived information only to a person legally authorized to receive it. Prohibits exceeding the authority under, or knowingly releasing information in violation of, this Act.