Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 01/25/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/25/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/26/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/31/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/01/2005