Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/28/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/25/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/19/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/26/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/27/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 10/06/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/19/2006