Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/25/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 10/25/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/01/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/12/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/25/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/25/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/25/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/25/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/09/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/08/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/08/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/29/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/14/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/12/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/26/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/14/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/20/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/20/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/25/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/26/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/28/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/13/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/13/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/13/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/13/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/14/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 12/06/2006