Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 10/26/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/26/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/26/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/06/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/02/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/08/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/11/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/20/2006