There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

FCC Indeceny Penalties bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Broadcast Decency Enforcement Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Broadcast Decency Enforcement Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the penalties for violations by television and radio broadcasters of the prohibitions against transmission of obscene, indecent, and profane language.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/15/2006Became Public Law No: 109-235. (TXT | PDF)
06/15/2006Signed by President.
06/08/2006Presented to President.
06/07/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 35 (Roll no. 230).(text: CR 6/06/2006 H3388)
05/18/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4816; text as passed Senate: CR S4816)
05/18/2006Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/26/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/15/2006Became Public Law No: 109-235. (TXT | PDF)
06/15/2006Signed by President.
06/08/2006SenatePresented to President.
06/07/2006-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2006-5:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 35 (Roll no. 230). (text: CR 6/06/2006 H3388)
06/07/2006-5:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3466-3467)
06/06/2006-8:38pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/06/2006-8:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 193.
06/06/2006-8:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3388-3391)
06/06/2006-8:19pmHouseMr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/05/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/19/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/19/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/19/2006-9:40amHouseReceived in the House.
05/18/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4816; text as passed Senate: CR S4816)
05/18/2006SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/26/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/26/2005 Referred to
05/18/2006 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce05/19/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and the Internet06/05/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.193. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-235 (06/15/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Broadcast Decency Enforcement Act of 2005 - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to provide that, if the violator of the terms and conditions of any Federal Communications Commission (FCC) license, permit, or certificate is either a broadcast station licensee or permittee or an applicant for a broadcast license, permit, or certificate, and such violator is determined by the FCC to have broadcast obscene, indecent, or profane language, the amount of forfeiture penalty shall not exceed $325,000 for each violation or day of such violation, to a maximum of $3 million for any single act or failure to act.