Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 11/01/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 11/01/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/01/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 11/01/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/02/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/02/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/03/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/07/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/07/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/09/2005