Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/26/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/01/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/09/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/17/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/24/2006