Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 11/02/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/02/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/07/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/27/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/05/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/26/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/27/2006