Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 11/03/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 11/03/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 11/03/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 11/03/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 11/03/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 11/03/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/08/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/08/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/08/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/08/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/09/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/10/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/10/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/10/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/14/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 11/14/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/15/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/17/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/17/2005