There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the transfer of items in the War Reserves Stockpile for Allies, Korea.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-159. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005Presented to President.
12/18/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H12182-12183)
11/09/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12628; text as passed Senate: CR S12628)
11/09/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-159. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005SenatePresented to President.
12/18/2005-2:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2005-2:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H12182-12183)
12/18/2005-2:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1988.
12/18/2005-2:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12182-12183)
12/18/2005-2:26pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/30/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
11/14/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/14/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/14/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/14/2005-7:13pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/09/2005SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12628; text as passed Senate: CR S12628)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations11/14/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services11/14/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness11/30/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1988.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1988. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-159 (12/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the President to transfer to the Republic of Korea U.S. Department of Defense (DOD) obsolete or surplus munitions, equipment, and materiel (such as tanks, trucks, artillery, mortars, general purpose bombs, repair parts, barrier material, and ancillary equipment) that are intended for use as reserve stocks for the Republic of Korea and that are stockpiled in the Republic of Korea or Japan.

States that: (1) the value of such concessions shall be at least equal to the transferred items' fair market value, less any DOD savings (which may not exceed the fair market value of the items transferred) from the avoidance of removal or disposition costs; and (2) such concessions may include cash compensation, services, waiver of charges otherwise payable by the United States (such as charges for demolition of U.S.-owned or U.S.-intended munitions), and other items of value.

Terminates such transfer authority three years after the date of the enactment of this Act.

Directs the Secretary of DOD to certify to the appropriate congressional committees whether or not the items in the War Reserves Stockpile for Allies, Korea available for transfer to the Republic of Korea are of any utility to the United States for: (1) counterterrorism operations; (2) contingency operations; (3) training; or (4) stockpile, pre-positioning, or war reserve requirements.

Terminates the War Reserves Stockpile for Allies, Korea program at the conclusion of such transfer. Directs DOD to remove or dispose of any remaining items in the War Reserves Stockpile for Allies, Korea.