There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Stolen Valor Act of 2005

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Stolen Valor Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Stolen Valor Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Stolen Valor Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to enhance protections relating to the reputation and meaning of the Medal of Honor and other military decorations and awards, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2006Became Public Law No: 109-437. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006Presented to President.
12/06/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/7/2006 H8819-8820)
09/07/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text as passed Senate: CR S9215-9216)
09/07/2006Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9215-9216;)
11/10/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2006Became Public Law No: 109-437. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2006-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2006-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/7/2006 H8819-8820)
12/06/2006-3:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1998.
12/06/2006-3:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 12/7/2006 H8819-8823)
12/06/2006-3:49pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/08/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/08/2006-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/08/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/07/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S9215-9216)
09/07/2006SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9215-9216;)
11/10/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
11/10/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S12688-12689)

Cosponsors (27)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary11/10/2005 Referred to
09/07/2006 Discharged from
House Judiciary09/08/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1998. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-437 (12/20/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Stolen Valor Act of 2005 - Amends the federal criminal code to expand the prohibition against wearing, manufacturing, or selling military decorations or medals without legal authorization to prohibit purchasing, soliciting, mailing, shipping, importing, exporting, producing blank certificates of receipt for, advertising, trading, bartering, or exchanging such decorations or medals without authorization.

Prohibits falsely representing oneself as having been awarded any decoration or medal authorized by Congress for the Armed Forces or any of the service medals or badges.

Increases penalties for violations if the offense involves a distinguished service cross, an Air Force Cross, a Navy Cross, a silver star, or a Purple Heart.