There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Buffalo Soldiers Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Buffalo Soldiers Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Buffalo Soldiers Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Buffalo Soldiers Commemoration Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Buffalo Soldiers Commemoration Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the American Battle Monuments Commission to establish in the State of Louisiana a memorial to honor the Buffalo Soldiers.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-152. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005Presented to President.
12/19/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H12215)
12/19/2005Committee on Resources discharged.
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as reported in Senate: CR S9028; text as passed Senate: CR S9028)
03/09/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment. With written report No. 109-24.
01/31/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/30/2005Became Public Law No: 109-152. (TXT | PDF)
12/30/2005Signed by President.
12/22/2005SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2005-12:58amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2005-12:58amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H12215)
12/19/2005-12:58amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12215)
12/19/2005-12:58amHouseMr. Pombo asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/19/2005HouseCommittee on Resources discharged.
08/08/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as reported in Senate: CR S9028; text as passed Senate: CR S9028)
03/09/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
03/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici with an amendment. With written report No. 109-24.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/31/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S653)
01/31/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S652-653)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/31/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/31/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
03/09/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-24
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
12/19/2005 Discharged from
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/08/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.205.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.205. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-152 (12/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 9, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Buffalo Soldiers Commemoration Act of 2005 - Authorizes the American Battle Monuments Commission to establish a memorial to honor the Buffalo Soldiers in or around New Orleans, Louisiana, on land donated for such purpose or on federal land with the consent of the appropriate land manager.

Directs the Commission: (1) to solicit and accept contributions for the memorial's construction and maintenance; and (2) prior to beginning construction, to enter into an agreement with an appropriate public or private entity to provide for the permanent maintenance of the memorial and to have sufficient funds (or assurance that it will receive sufficient funds) to complete the memorial. Authorizes the Commission to enter into a cooperative agreement with a private or public entity for fundraising purposes.

Directs the Commission: (1) to maintain an escrow account to pay expenses incurred in constructing the memorial; (2) to deposit into the account any principal and interest by the United States that the Chairman determines has a suitable maturity; and (3) after construction, to transfer account amounts to the entity providing for permanent maintenance of the memorial.

Authorizes appropriations.